THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:44:54 AM
Vupputuri, Sujana Kumari
CPSO#:
59330
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jun 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Clinic
150 York Street, Suite 1500
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2021
Corporation Name: Vupputuri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUJANA KUMARI VUPPUTURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VUPPUTURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1989 |