THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:05:04 AM
Graham, Susan Frances Bishop
CPSO#:
59328
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Jan 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Susan B. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1) Delhi Family Health Team, 105 Main Street, Delhi, Ontario N4B 2L8
2) Norfolk General Hospital, Medical Records Department, 365 West Street, Simcoe, Ontario N3V 1T7
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |