THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:46:11 PM
Allain, Suzanne Marguerite
CPSO#:
59326
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
P7B 5G7
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G4
Phone: (807) 343-2431 Ext. 2148
Fax: (807) 343-4361
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARGUERITE ALLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLAIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1989 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 1993 |