THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:04:49 AM
Buys, Yvonne Margareth
CPSO#:
59322
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Yvonne M. Buys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 23 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto Western Hospital, Health Records, 399 Bathurst St, Toronto, Ontario, M5T 2S8
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:19 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |