THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:23:47 AM
Sakamoto, Terence Keith
CPSO#:
59304
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Dec 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
R R 5
123 Millennium Parkway
Belleville ON K8N 4Z5
Phone: (613) 961-7440
Fax: (613) 961-1798
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:28 Oct 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERENCE KEITH SAKAMOTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKAMOTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 1989 |