THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:34:37 AM
Kaiser, William James
CPSO#:
59300
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 May 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 1990 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JAMES KAISER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAISER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 1990 |