THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:17:06 PM
Yoshida, Kenneth M
CPSO#:
59288
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jan 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jan 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Upper Suite 104
316 George Street
Sarnia ON N7T 4P4
Phone: (519) 336-6765
Fax: (519) 336-7319
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:04 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH M YOSHIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOSHIDA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 May 1988 to 12 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 May 1993 to 07 Jun 1993
EL - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 1989 |