THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:32:12 PM
Hurwitz, Joel Simeon
CPSO#:
59285
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 May 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Mar 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joel Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor St
London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 23 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 May 2019 |