Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Farsi, French, Persian, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 16, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 19, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Roya Rahimpour to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2020:
Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Rahimpour’s conduct and standard of practice in her general medicine practice, she underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of her practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Rahimpour’s standard of practice in her general medicine practice. As a result:
Dr. Rahimpour will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.
Dr. Rahimpour will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping.
Dr. Rahimpour’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 14, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)