THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:22:02 PM
Rene, Sylvain A
CPSO#:
59163
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1901 Yonge Street, unit 4
Toronto ON M4S 1Y6
Phone: (416) 483-0102
Fax: (416) 483-9393
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S. A. Rene Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 25 Jan 1988 to 20 Jan 1989
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Mar 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 15 Sep 2016 |
|
Active |