THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:24:19 PM
Levy, Maurice
CPSO#:
59157
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Hebrew
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 7 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record with Dr. Levy should contact Records Management Ltd. Toll-Free at (1-800-775-0093).
Date Received: 14 Feb 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:24 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2022 |