THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:39:49 PM
Luterman, Maynard
CPSO#:
59109
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
65 Third Street
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: 9058716600 Ext. 33250
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Minnesota
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 May 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAYNARD LUTERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 1987 |