THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 13:35:23 PM
Smith, Philip Loren
CPSO#:
59079
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Nov 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. P. L. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Niagara Health
St. Catharines Site
1200 4th Ave
St. Catharines ON LZ5 0A9
Date Received: 21 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |