THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:39:46 AM
Sharad, Sunil
CPSO#:
59047
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bajaj Sharad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Nov 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2021 |