THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:43:53 AM
Myles, Wellington Michael
CPSO#:
59025
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. W.M. Myles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:10 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Nov 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 May 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2023 |