THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:10:27 PM
Hu, Fang
CPSO#:
58996
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Aug 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Aug 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Chungshan Medical College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
South Simcoe Medical
239 Holland Street West
Bradford ON L3Z 1H9
Phone: (905) 775-4863
Fax: (905) 775-8351
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FANG HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 06 Nov 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jul 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1998 |