THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:49:03 AM
Prichard, Hugh Leslie
CPSO#:
58883
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hugh Prichard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
CF - Radiation Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Feb 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Feb 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2014 |