THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:42:05 PM
Martin, David Charles
CPSO#:
58837
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12 Grote St
St Catharines ON L2N 2E7
Phone: 905 9374575
Fax: 905 9374642
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their record can contact Niagara Health - St. Catharines Site: 1200 Fourth Ave, St. Catharines, ON L2S 0A9, Tel: (905) 378-4647, extension 44470, Fax: 905-684-1136.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre |
St Catharines |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1987 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 13, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)