THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:00:13 AM
MacDonald, James Kerry
CPSO#:
58832
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Kerry MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:09 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2023 |