THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 20:58:07 PM
Powell-Francis, Kathryn Anne
CPSO#:
58825
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Pain Clinic
Unit 425
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 438-7080
Fax: (416) 438-7072
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN ANNE POWELL-FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POWELL-FRANCIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Nov 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 1990 |