THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:29:38 PM
Curnew, Gregory Paul
CPSO#:
58797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2A
232 Cannon Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 0A9
Phone: (905) 667-0783
Fax: (905) 667-0785
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:28 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GREGORY PAUL CURNEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURNEW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1988 |