THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:58:14 PM
Lawrence, Sarah Elizabeth
CPSO#:
58793
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Nov 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Muirhead, Sarah Elizabeth (used until: 12 Jan 2003 )
Lawrence, Sarah Elizabeth (used until: 09 Jun 1988 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road, Room 5109A
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2434
Fax: (613) 738-4215
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:08 Sep 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH ELIZABETH LAWRENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAWRENCE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 1992 |