THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:42:01 AM
Rottapel, Robert Kenneth
CPSO#:
58792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: George Washington University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5420
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT KENNETH ROTTAPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTTAPEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1989 |