THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:17:54 AM
Lorimer, John Wilson
CPSO#:
58790
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
28 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Lorimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 15 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2018 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2023 |