THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:01:46 PM
Goldman, Mindy Rona
CPSO#:
58788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Blood Services
1800 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa ON K1G 4J5
Phone: (613) 739-2577
Fax: (613) 739-2002
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MINDY RONA GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1989 |