THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:18:30 PM
Zaremba, Janina
CPSO#:
58745
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
27 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zaremba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients who are looking for a copy of their medical record may contact:
DocuDavit Solutions
P.O. Box 58045
Toronto, ON M6A 3C8
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Tel: 416-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 29 Feb 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2019 |