THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:06:28 AM
Tromp, Margaret Mary
CPSO#:
58735
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko General Hospital
PO Box 34
Moose Factory ON P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: August 8, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On August 31, 2012, Quinte Health Care notified the College that the anaesthesia component of Dr. Margaret Mary Tromp's General Practitioner Anaesthesia privileges was suspended, effective August 8, 2012.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1987 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 24 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 05 Sep 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 05 Sep 2014 |
|
Active |