THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:51:51 PM
Abraham, Gebrehiwot
CPSO#:
58710
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English, Eritrean
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32254
Fax: (416) 979-6864
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gebrehiwot Abraham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 Jun 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEBREHIWOT ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1990 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1990 |