THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:11:08 AM
Bartosik, Lidia Maria
CPSO#:
58643
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0328
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lidia Bartosik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 4 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway W
Mississauga, Ontario,
L5B 1B8
Date Received: 19 Apr 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:05 Jun 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1989 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1990 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Apr 2021 |