THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:20:08 PM
Roche, Mark James
CPSO#:
58624
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Roche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 28 May 1999
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Nov 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |