THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:28:20 AM
Mercer, Deanna Marie
CPSO#:
58605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Krasilczuk, Deanna Marie (used until: 14 Jul 1987 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1145 Carling Ave
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Center
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: 613 722 6521
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEANNA MARIE MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 1988 |