THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:09:22 PM
Flynn, Leslie Vaughan
CPSO#:
58587
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hopital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3522
Fax: 613 544-9666
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE VAUGHAN FLYNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLYNN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Sep 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 May 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 29 May 1994 to 28 May 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 29 May 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 1989 |