THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:42:44 AM
Strban, Martin
CPSO#:
58580
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Slovak
Education: Queen's University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 222
Fax: (519) 741-5772
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN STRBAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRBAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1989 |