THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:27:55 AM
Kalyniuk, Norman Joseph
CPSO#:
58557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 221
679 Davis Dr.
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 717-1614
Fax: (888) 294-5888
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Norman J. Kalyniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their medical record may contact Records Management Ltd. at: 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13, Toronto, Ontario, M9L 0A3. Phone: 1-800-755-0093. Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 26 Feb 2020
Instructions/Address:Records Management Company
Tel: 1-800-755-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 24 Sep 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NORMAN JOSEPH KALYNIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALYNIUK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1988 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)