THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:00:19 AM
Hakim, Omar Javed
CPSO#:
58554
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LasikMD Waterloo
Frederick Tower
101 Frederick St.
Ground Floor
Kitchener ON N2H 6R2
Phone: (519) 772-1284
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:11 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR JAVED HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1991 |