THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 15:07:16 PM
Semmler, Robert Thompson
CPSO#:
58546
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
208-849 Alexander Crt
Trent Regional Sleep Clinic
Peterborough ON K9J 7H8
Phone: 705-743-9509
Fax: 705-743-2341
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMPSON SEMMLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEMMLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Jan 1989 to 30 Jan 1989
EL - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Neurology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1988 |