THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:16:35 PM
Bredeson, Christopher Norman
CPSO#:
58543
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 73904
Fax: (613) 737-8861
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:16 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER NORMAN BREDESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BREDESON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Nov 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |