THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:13:49 AM
Cortese, Leonardo
CPSO#:
58538
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Rome, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111 Ext. 76970
Fax: (519) 257-5255
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L. Cortese Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 1 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEONARDO CORTESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTESE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1991 |