THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:35:16 AM
Groenewoud, Yolanda Alice
CPSO#:
58537
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
220-340 College St
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: 4169224644
Fax: 4169222335
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Y.A. Groenewoud Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 10 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:03 Sep 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YOLANDA ALICE GROENEWOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROENEWOUD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1988 |