THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:18:00 AM
Liu-P'ng, Tina Tin-Shun
CPSO#:
58494
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Liu, Tina Tin-Shun (used until: 28 Jun 1988 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2133 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON M8V 0B3
Phone: 4162558251
Fax: 4162526875
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Aug 1989 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TINA TIN-SHUN LIU-P'NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU-P'NG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1988 |