THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 8:07:27 AM
Kovacs, Julie Anne Josephine
CPSO#:
58487
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 801
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 482-4001
Fax: (416) 482-4003
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J.A.J. Kovacs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:21 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE JOSEPHINE KOVACS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOVACS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1988 |