THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:16:33 AM
Taylor, Steven Joseph
CPSO#:
58451
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
Phone: (519) 570-1200
Fax: (519) 570-1214
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOSEPH TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2021 |