THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:19:23 PM
Redhead, Clint Anthony
CPSO#:
58447
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mattawa Medical Clinic
217 Turcotte Park Rd.
Box 70
Mattawa ON P0H 1V0
Phone: (705) 744-6000
Fax: (705) 744-6011
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Clint Redhead Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. |
Mattawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLINT ANTHONY REDHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDHEAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Rotating - Incomplete Information
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2013 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 31 Mar 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2014 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 May 2013
Summary:
On May 15, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clint Anthony Redhead committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Committee found that it was inappropriate that Dr. Redhead engaged in a sexual relationship with Ms X, a former patient, only a few weeks after the end of their doctor-patient relationship.
Dr. Redhead had treated Ms X on several occasions while on call at a hospital. He attended on Ms X in person as a patient on five occasions: twice on November 12 and then on December 27, 28 and 29, 2006. Dr. Redhead was aware of Ms X's vulnerabilities and he treated her for mental illness, which consisted of depression, anxiety, and suicidal ideation. Although the Committee did not make a specific finding as to the date of commencement of the sexual relationship, the evidence is that the sexual relationship commenced at either the end of January 2007 or early in
February 2007.
Dr. Redhead also gave gifts to Ms X. He knew that she was emotionally and financially needy. The giving of gifts by Dr. Redhead to someone who he knew had such problems, served only to deepen her dependence on him and thus exploited her vulnerability and augmented the power imbalance between them.
On October 30, 2013, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Redhead appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Redhead's certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months, to commence on October 31, 2013 at 11:59 p.m.
3. The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Redhead's certificate of registration effective immediately:
(i) at his own expense, Dr. Redhead shall successfully complete College-facilitated instruction in Professionalism/Ethics no later than one (1) year from the date of this Order.
4. Dr. Redhead pay costs to the College in the amount of $25,000.00 within sixty (60) days from the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 21-25, 2011, October 22, 24-25, 2012