THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:15:43 AM
Giaccone, Roberto Antonio
CPSO#:
58384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive
Suite 306
Nepean ON K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 723-8733
Fax: (613) 723-2925
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:25 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERTO ANTONIO GIACCONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIACCONE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1988 |