THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:54:36 AM
Bonin, Michel Lloyd
CPSO#:
58383
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Mar 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 North Shore Rd
Whitefish ON P0M 3E0
Phone: 705 618-3492
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. |
Mattawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:27 May 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL LLOYD BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 1989 |