THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:56:39 AM
Butler, Deborah Joan
CPSO#:
58367
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 401
73 Water Street North
Cambridge ON N1R 7L6
Phone: (519) 620-2223
Fax: (519) 620-7183
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOAN BUTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTLER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1988 |