THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:38:36 AM
Charbonneau, Yoland Raynald
CPSO#:
58361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Yoland Charbonneau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YOLAND RAYNALD CHARBONNEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARBONNEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 15 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1989 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1990 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)