THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:11:54 PM
Wiens, Andrew Stewart
CPSO#:
58346
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6506
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Anson General Hospital |
Iroquois Falls |
Bingham Memorial Hospital |
Matheson |
Lady Minto Hospital |
Cochrane |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEWART WIENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 1992 to 31 Jul 1993
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1988 |