THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:11:11 AM
Tousignant, Claude Pierre Joseph
CPSO#:
58345
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 May 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 May 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Jun 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLAUDE PIERRE JOSEPH TOUSIGNANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUSIGNANT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 May 1994 |