THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:44:47 AM
Robb, Marjorie Elizabeth
CPSO#:
58342
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Robb-Aquino, Marjorie Elizabeth (used until: 13 Feb 2007 )
Robb, Marjorie Elizabeth (used until: 21 Jun 1988 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
CHEO/Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
6 West
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600
Fax: 613-738-2891
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARJORIE ELIZABETH ROBB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 28 Oct 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1987 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |